Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1085105

EP1085105 - Free cutting alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tohoku Technoarch Co., Ltd.
468, Aoba, Aramaki Aza, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0845 / JP
For all designated states
Japan Industrial Technology Association
Toranomon 1 Chome Mori Building, 1-19-5, Toranomon, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
For all designated states
Oikawa, Katsunari
4-1-34, Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho Shibata-gun
Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
Tohoku Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
23, Aza-nishigaoka, Oaza-murata, Murata-cho Shibata-gun
Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
Ishida, Kiyohito
5-20 Kamisugi 3-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi
Miyagi-ken / JP
[2006/26]
Former [2004/05]For all designated states
Tohoku Technoarch Co., Ltd.
468, Aoba, Aramaki Aza, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0845 / JP
For all designated states
Japan Industrial Technology Association
Toranomon 1 Chome Mori Building, 1-19-5, Toranomon, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
For all designated states
Oikawa, Katsunari
4-1-34, Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
Tohoku Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
23, Aza-nishigaoka, Oaza-murata, Murata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome
Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
For all designated states
Ishida, Kiyohito
5-20 Kamisugi 3-chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
Former [2003/46]For all designated states
Tohoku Technoarch Co., Ltd.
468, Aoba, Aramaki Aza, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0845 / JP
For all designated states
Japan Industrial Technology Association
Toranomon 1 Chome Mori Building, 1-19-5, Toranomon, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0001 / JP
For all designated states
Oikawa, Katsunari
4-1-34, Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
Tohoku Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
23, Aza-nishigaoka, Oaza-murata, Murata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome
Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Ishida, Kiyohito
5-20 Kamisugi 3-chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
For all designated states
Kogyo Gijutsuincho
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Oikawa, Katsunari
4-1-34, Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
Tohoku Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha
23, Aza-nishigaoka, Oaza-murata, Murata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
For all designated states
DAIDO TOKUSHUKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
11-18, Nishiki 1-chome
Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishida, Kiyohito
5-20, Kamisugi 3-chome, Aoba-ku
Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP
02 / Oikawa, Katsunari
4-1-34, Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
03 / Ebata, Takashi, c/o Tohoku Tokushuko K.K.
23, Aza-nishigaoka, Oaza-murata, Murata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi / JP
04 / Inoguchi, Takayuki
18, Minamishikamochi, Kagiya-cho
Tokai-shi, Aichi / JP
05 / Shimizu, Tetsuya
1410, Takashima 2-chome, Tenpaku-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP
06 / Okabe, Michio
137, Kyokutodai
Chita-shi, Aichi / JP
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)ter Meer, Nicolaus , et al
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/46]ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr. , et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2001/12]ter Meer, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Chem., Dr.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00118990.101.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateJP1999025090203.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25090299
JP2000007025714.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000070257
JP2000022143321.07.2000         Original published format: JP 2000221433
JP2000025160222.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000251602
JP2000025162622.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000251626
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1085105
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1085105
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1085105
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C22C38/60, C22C38/40, C22C38/28, C22C38/18, C22C19/05, C22C27/06
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/07]
Former [2001/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatenlegierung[2001/12]
English:Free cutting alloy[2001/12]
French:Alliage de décolletage[2001/12]
Examination procedure25.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
08.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2006Fee for grant paid
31.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04004043.8  / EP1431409
EP04004044.6  / EP1431410
EP04004045.3  / EP1431411
EP04004046.1  / EP1431412
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH11229082  ;
 [X]EP0903418  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 48 *;
 [Y]GB1519313  (SANDVIK AB) [Y] 5-15 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 12 * * page 3; table 1 *;
 [X]JPH11229032  ;
 [X]EP0767247  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 46 *;
 [PX]JPH11293390  ;
 [A]JPH10130794  ;
 [A]JPS6393843  ;
 [A]JPH02170948  ;
 [A]JPH11140597  ;
 [PA]US6033625  (NAGASHIMA TOMOTAKA [JP], et al) [PA] 5,17-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4705581  (HONKURA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 17-30 * column 4, line 23 - line 52; tables 1,2 *;
 [A]JPS60155653
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [XAY]  - R.KIESSLING ET AL, Non-metallic inclusions in steel, LONDON, GB, THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIALS, (1978), XP002155733 [X] 1-3 * page 138, line 10 - line 17 * * page 139, line 21 - line 22 * * page 144, paragraph K14 - page 145, line 15 * [A] 17-30 [Y] 5-15
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, [PX] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [A] 5-15,17-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880908), vol. 012, no. 333, Database accession no. (C - 526), [A] 17-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900919), vol. 014, no. 439, Database accession no. (C - 0761), [A] 17-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, [A] 5,17-30 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851219), vol. 009, no. 324, Database accession no. (C - 320), [A] 9-12,14,15,31,32 * abstract *