Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1085015

EP1085015 - Catalyst comprising a nitrogen-containing heterocylic compound [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0001 / JP
[2008/01]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1, Teppo-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka 590-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishii, Yasutaka
19-21, Bessyohonmachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1112 / JP
02 / Nakano, Tatusya
22-4, Arashiyama-cho
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0029 / JP
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00119020.601.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateJP1999024808401.09.1999         Original published format: JP 24808499
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1085015
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1085015
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07D249/18, C07D253/08, B01J23/00
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/36]
Former [2001/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eine stickstoffhaltige heterocyclische Verbindung enthaltender Katalysator[2001/12]
English:Catalyst comprising a nitrogen-containing heterocylic compound[2001/12]
French:Catalyseur comprenant un composé hétérocyclique contenant de l'azote[2001/12]
Examination procedure14.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
20.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/44]
21.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200910   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2202613  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1-5 * page 14 *;
 [X]WO9429425  (CALL HANS PETER [DE]) [X] 1-5 * example 1 *;
 [X]  REBEK ET AL, "The three-Phase Test for Reaction Intermediates", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (1975), vol. 97, no. 2, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 454 - 455, XP002257443 [X] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00835a057
 [X]  SPETZLER, JANE C. ET AL, "Novel acylation catalysts in peptide synthesis: derivatives of N-hydroxytriazoles and N-hydroxytetrazoles", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1: ORGANIC AND BIO-ORGANIC CHEMISTRY (1998), (10), 1727-1732, (1998), XP002257444 [X] 1-5 * compound 13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a707313e
 [X]  BOHMER, SIEGMUND ET AL, "Degradation of polycyclic aromatic hydrocarbons by laccase in the presence of mediator compounds", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:342371 CA, URL: STN, XP002257445 [X] 1-5 * abstract *
    [] INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BIOTECHNOLOGY IN THE PULP AND PAPER INDUSTRY, 7TH, VANCOUVER, B. C., JUNE 16-19, 1998 (1998), VOLUME B, B199-B202 PUBLISHER: CANADIAN PULP AND PAPER ASSOCIATION, TECHNICAL SECTION, MONTREAL, QUE., (1998),
 [A]  ISHII Y ET AL, "ALKANE OXIDATION WITH MOLECULAR OXYGEN USING A NEW EFFICIENT CATALYTIC SYSTEM: N-HYDROXYPHTHALIMIDE (NHPI) COMBINED WITH CO(ACAC)N (N = 2 OR 3)", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19960712), vol. 61, no. 14, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4520 - 4526, XP000591064 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo951970l
 [A]  ISHII, YASUTAKA ET AL, "A new strategy for alkane oxidation with O2 using N- hydroxyphthalimide (NHPI) as a radical catalyst", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 131:144306 CA, URL: STN, XP002257446 [A] 1-5 * abstract *
    [] CATALYSIS SURVEYS FROM JAPAN (1999), 3(1), 27-35, (1999),
 [A]  ISHII, YASUTAKA, "A novel catalysis of N- hydroxyphthalimide (NHPI) combined with Co(acac)n (n = 2 or 3) in the oxidation of organic substrates with molecular oxygen", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 126:237962 CA, URL: STN, XP002257447 [A] 1-5 * abstract *
    [] JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL (1997), 117(1-3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON THE ACTIVATION OF DIOXYGEN AND HOMOGENEOUS CATALYTIC OXIDATION, 1996), 123-137, (1997),