Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084895

EP1084895 - Electric vehicle control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS CANADA LIMITED
16 Industrial Park Road Tilbury
Ontario N0P 2LO / CA
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
SIEMENS CANADA LIMITED
16 Industrial Park Road
Tilbury, Ontario N0P 2LO / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Daly, Paul D
2166 Joanne
Troy, Michigan 48084 / US
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Siemens House
Oldbury, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Siemens House Oldbury Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Former [2001/12]Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date00119178.205.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateUS19990152998P09.09.1999         Original published format: US 152998 P
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1084895
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60L15/20, B60L11/18
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/50]
Former [2001/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regelsystem für ein elektrisches Fahrzeug[2001/12]
English:Electric vehicle control system[2001/12]
French:Système de régulation pour un véhicule électrique[2001/12]
Examination procedure05.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
10.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19617548  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 14-17;
 [X]EP0771688  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH09238402  ;
 [A]EP0773131  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 2,9 * column 4, line 5 - line 14 *;
 [A]US4061838  (JAGER PHILIPP) [A] 5,6,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [A] 1-3,9-11 * abstract *