Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1084732

EP1084732 - Tanning bed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kopper, Iris
Hellerstrasse 503
44227 Dortmund / DE
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Pürschel, Dieter
Hellerstrasse 503
44227 Dortmund / DE
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner , et al
Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner , et al
Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2
57072 Siegen / DE
Application number, filing date00119212.906.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateDE199914497515.09.1999         Original published format: DE 19944975
[2001/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1084732
Date:21.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1084732
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2001/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:Bräunungsliege[2001/12]
English:Tanning bed[2001/12]
French:Lit de bronzage[2001/12]
Examination procedure15.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/10]
22.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200203   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2002
30.09.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5683437  (DOTY JOHN STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0612539  (KOENIG KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1-8; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3927695  (KRATZ JOSEF GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document *