Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095590

EP1095590 - Fixing device for removably attaching a strap to a binoculars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2005  [2005/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steiner -Optik GmbH
Dr.-Hans-Frisch-Strasse 9
95448 Bayreuth / DE
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Seifert, Kuno
Schlesienstrasse 16
95490 Mistelgau / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Schneck, Herbert , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte
Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr. , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date00119245.906.09.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateDE199914992016.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19949920
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095590
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095590
Date:20.08.2003
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:A45F5/00, A44B11/25
[2003/34]
Former International [2001/18]A45F5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Befestigungseinrichtung zur lösbaren Verbindung eines Halteriemens mit einem Fernglas[2001/18]
English:Fixing device for removably attaching a strap to a binoculars[2001/18]
French:Dispositif pour fixer de manière détachable une sangle à des jumelles[2001/18]
Examination procedure17.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/38]
27.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.07.2004Fee for grant paid
14.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/41]
11.05.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5740952  (HUCKENBECK CLAUS O [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [A]DE3027818  (LEITZ ERNST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 12 *;
 [A]US3171183  (JOHNSTON JAMES R) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 6, line 64 *;
 [PA]US6003213  (KELLER STEVEN C [US], et al) [PA] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 10, line 62 *;
 [A]US737068  (BRIEL JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *