EP1083582 - Dye sensitized photoelectrochemical cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Tetsuya c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2008/50] |
Former [2001/11] | 01 /
Watanabe, Tetsuya, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119286.3 | 06.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | JP19990252754 | 07.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25275499 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083582 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083582 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083582 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/20, H01L51/30 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
H10K85/652 (EP);
H01G9/2031 (EP);
H01G9/2059 (EP);
Y02E10/542 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/11] | H01G9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Farbstoffsensiblisierte photoelektrochemische Zelle | [2001/11] | English: | Dye sensitized photoelectrochemical cell | [2001/11] | French: | Cellule photoelectrochimique sensibilisée par des chromophores | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | IT | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | GB | 06.09.2009 | IE | 06.09.2009 | LU | 06.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 06.09.2009 | ||
LU | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
IT | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
IE | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2936730 (LILLY INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]EP0924724 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A] - TRIBUTSCH H, "Elektrochemische Untersuchung über die Sensibiliserungseigenschaften und das photochemische Verhalten von Pseudoisocyanin-Farbstoffaggreg aten an ZnO-Elektroden", BER.BUNSENGES.PHYS.CHEM, WEINHEIM, DE, (1969), vol. 73, no. 6, pages 582 - 590, XP002124850 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |