Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054050

EP1054050 - Method for providing a tube having carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/47]Method for providing a tube having coke formation and carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons
[2002/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
216 Patent Library Building
Bartlesville Technology Center
Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
ConocoPhillips Company
216 Patent Library Building, Bartlesville Technology Center
Bartlesville, OK 74004 / US
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
5th and Keeler
Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brown, Ronald E.
6419 Quail Ridge Rd.
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
02 / Reed, Larry E.
P.O. Box 2461
Bartlesville, OK 74005-2461 / US
03 / Greenwood, Gil J.
1429 S. Shawnee
Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US
04 / Harper, Timothy P.
4964 SE Brooklin Drive
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
05 / Scharre, Mark D.
Chevron Philips Chemical Puerto Rico Core, Inc.
Call Box 10003, Guayama, PR 00785 / PR
 [2001/11]
Former [2000/47]01 / Brown, Ronald E.
6419 Quail Ridge Rd.
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
02 / Reed, Larry E.
P.O. Box 2461
Bartlesville, OK 74005-2461 / US
03 / Greenwood, Gil J.
1429 S. Shawnee
Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US
04 / Harper, Timothy P.
4964 SE Brooklin Drive
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
05 / Scharre, Mark D.
2809 Claremont Drive
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
Representative(s)Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dost, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Former [2000/47]Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00119326.722.03.1996
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateUS1995040929223.03.1995         Original published format: US 409292
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1054050
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1054050
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054050
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10G9/14, C10G9/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Versorgung eines Rohres mit Kohlenmonoxidhemmenden Eigenschaften beim thermischen Kracken von Kohlenwasserstoffen[2002/14]
English:Method for providing a tube having carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons[2002/14]
French:Méthode pour fournir un tube ayant des propriétés d'inhibiteur de formation de monoxyde de carbone lorsqu'utilisé dans le craguage d'hydrocarbures[2002/14]
Former [2000/47]Verfahren zur Versorgung eines Rohres mit Koksanlagerung- und Kohlenmonoxidhemmenden Eigenschaften beim thermischen Kracken von Kohlenwasserstoffen
Former [2000/47]Method for providing a tube having coke formation and carbon monoxide inhibiting properties when used for the thermal cracking of hydrocarbons
Former [2000/47]Méthode pour fournir un tube ayant des propriétés d'inhibiteur de formation de coke et de monoxyde de carbone lorsqu'utilisé dans le craguage d'hydrocarbures
Examination procedure10.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
25.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.07.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2002Fee for grant paid
21.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96104603.4  / EP0733693
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1234205  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR1468873  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2307300  (HAPPEL JOHN, et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,4 *;
 [A]EP0540084  (DONEGANI GUIDO IST [IT], et al);
 [A]US5284994  (BROWN RONALD E [US], et al);
 [PA]DE4405884  (MANNESMANN AG [DE], et al)