Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083626

EP1083626 - Compact frequency selective reflector antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Los Angeles
CA 90067-2199 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wu, Te-Kao
26911 Spring Creek Road
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00119345.707.09.2000
[2001/11]
Priority number, dateUS1999039438610.09.1999         Original published format: US 394386
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1083626
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1083626
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01Q19/195, H01Q15/00, H01Q25/00, H01Q19/19, H01Q5/00, H01Q19/10
[2002/26]
Former International [2001/11]H01Q19/195, H01Q15/00, H01Q25/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/11]
TitleGerman:Kompakte frequenzselektive Reflektorantenne[2001/11]
English:Compact frequency selective reflector antenna[2001/11]
French:Antenne à réflecteur à surface sélective en fréquence compacte[2001/11]
Examination procedure25.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
14.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5130718  (WU TE-KAO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 55; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [X]JPS54114065
 [X]  - UENO K ET AL, "LOW-LOSS KA-BAND FREQUENCY SELECTIVE SUBREFLECTOR", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19910620), vol. 27, no. 13, ISSN 0013-5194, page 1155, XP000238689 [X] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HONMA S ET AL, "PERFORMANCE MEASUREMENT OF FREQUENCY SELECTIVE REFLECTOR USING PLANAR NEAR-FIELD TECHNIQUES", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST. NEWPORT BEACH, JUNE 18 - 23, 1995. HELD IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE USNC/URSI NATIONAL RADIO SCIENCE MEETING, IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INSTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, NEW, (19950618), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-2720-9, pages 1663 - 1666, XP000588816 [X] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791113), vol. 003, no. 136, Database accession no. (E - 151), & JP54114065 A 19790905 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract *