Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091115

EP1091115 - Fuel supply system and method of operating this system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bosse, Rolf Dr.
Reichenberger Ring 40
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
02 / Lang, Thomas
Laagbergstrasse 55
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
03 / Meyer, Henning
Max-Valentin-Str. 28
38448 Wolfsburg / DE
 [2001/15]
Application number, filing date00119392.912.09.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateDE199914814907.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19948149
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091115
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091115
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091115
Date:17.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02M37/08
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Kraftstofförderanlage und Verfahren zum Betrieb der Kraftstofförderanlage[2001/15]
English:Fuel supply system and method of operating this system[2001/15]
French:Système d'alimentation en carburant et procédé pour faire fonctionner ce système[2001/15]
Examination procedure05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
17.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2005Fee for grant paid
20.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI17.08.2005
FR17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
CY12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
LU17.10.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
CY12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
FR30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
LU17.10.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2007/35]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
CY12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
LU17.10.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2007/20]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
CY12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
LU17.10.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2007/08]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
LU17.10.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/52]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
AT12.09.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/42]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
BE30.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/36]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
BE30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/35]FI17.08.2005
GB17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/30]FI17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
MC30.09.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/26]FI17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/25]FI17.08.2005
IE17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/14]FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI17.08.2005
SE17.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0819458  (FILTRAUTO [FR]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 30 - column 8, line 55; figure 2 * [A] 3;
 [XA]JPH11257189  ;
 [XA]GB2202034  (MANNESMANN KIENZLE GMBH) [X] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 3;
 [XA]WO9823858  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 2; figure 1 * [A] 3;
 [A]US5878718  (REMBOLD HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 2, line 49 - column 10, line 62; figures 1-6 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3