Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1085225

EP1085225 - Magnetic bearing device for motor-combined structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Barada, Toshimitsu
2-26-13, Omori Honcho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ooyama, Atsushi
182-7, Kuzuhara
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Nakazawa, Toshiharu
1-1, Hibarigaoka
Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Sekiguchi, Shinichi
3204-426, 3-2-3, Shiomidai, Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
05 / Komai, Masakazu
1-5-2, Mirokuji
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Geyer, Ulrich F. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER
Patentanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00119424.013.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateJP1999025936313.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25936399
[2001/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1085225
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1085225
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16C39/06, F16C32/04, H02K7/09
[2003/17]
Former International [2001/12]F16C39/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/03]
Former [2001/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetlager für kombinierte Motorstruktur[2001/12]
English:Magnetic bearing device for motor-combined structure[2001/12]
French:Palier magnétique pour structure combinée de moteur[2001/12]
Examination procedure21.10.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
13.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
02.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0681115  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 3 *;
 [Y]JPH05252691  ;
 [Y]US4823066  (YOSHIKI FUJIOKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 64 * * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0419656  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 17 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US3737748  (TEDERS P) [Y] 1 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940112), vol. 018, no. 017, Database accession no. (E - 1488), & JP05252691 A 19930928 (CHODENDO HATSUDEN KANREN KIKI ZAIRYO GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI) [Y] 1,3 * abstract *