EP1113092 - Cutting tool with multilayer, wear resistant coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALTER AG Derendinger Strasse 53 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzschuh, Helga, Dr. Ulmerstrasse 38/3 72537 Mehrstetten / DE | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119554.4 | 07.09.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | DE19991062056 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962056 | [2001/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1113092 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1113092 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113092 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23C30/00, B23B27/14, C23C16/40, C23C16/30 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C16/36 (EP,US);
C23C16/403 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | C23C30/00, B23B27/14, C23C16/40, C23C16/32, C23C16/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | Schneidwerkzeug mit mehrlagiger, verschleissfester Beschichtung | [2001/27] | English: | Cutting tool with multilayer, wear resistant coating | [2001/27] | French: | Outil de coupe ayant un revêtement multicouche resistant à l'usure | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.11.2004 | IE | 17.11.2004 | NL | 17.11.2004 | DK | 17.02.2005 | GR | 17.02.2005 | PT | 17.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
IE | 17.11.2004 | ||
NL | 17.11.2004 | ||
DK | 17.02.2005 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
IE | 17.11.2004 | ||
DK | 17.02.2005 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5423608 ; | [X]JPH0820871 ; | [X]JPH0827562 ; | [X]US4501786 (HALE THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1-3,5 *; | [A]WO9923275 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) [A] 1-20* figures 1A,1B; claims 1,7 *; | [PX]EP0980917 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4,8,9,11,13-17 * example 1; claim 1; table 2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 13, Database accession no. 1979-24767B, XP002188606 & JPS5423608 A 19790222 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND CO) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08020871 A 19960123 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0026] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08027562 A 19960130 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] * |