Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1086977

EP1086977 - Partially vulcanized shaped rubber composition and preparation of article, including tires, having a component thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street Akron
Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lickes, Jean-Paul
36, Rue de Montmédy
2164 Luxembourg / LU
02 / Gerard, Denis Jean René
Stockem, Route de Bouillon, 171
6700 Arlon / BE
03 / Henoumont, Marc Jules Alexis
27, Rue de la Chapelle
6720 Habay-la-Neuve / BE
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A. Patent Department
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A. Patent Department
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Former [2001/13]Leitz, Paul
Goodyear S.A., Patent-Department, Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
Application number, filing date00119762.311.09.2000
[2001/13]
Priority number, dateUS1999040059122.09.1999         Original published format: US 400591
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1086977
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1086977
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1086977
Date:02.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/24, B29B11/14, C08L21/00, B60C1/00, C08K3/04, C08K9/06, C08K3/34, B60C11/00
[2004/10]
Former International [2001/13]C08J3/24, B29B11/14, C08L21/00, B60C1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/48]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Teilvulkanisierte, geformte Kautschukmischung und Herstellung von Gegenständen, unter anderem Reifen, mit mindestens einem Bestandteil hergestellt aus dieser Mischung[2005/17]
English:Partially vulcanized shaped rubber composition and preparation of article, including tires, having a component thereof[2001/13]
French:Composition de caoutchouc moulé réticulé partiellement et préparation d' articles, y compris les pneus, contenant un élément à base de cette composition[2001/13]
Former [2001/13]Teilvulkanisierte, geformte Kautschukmischung und Herstellung von Gegenständen, Reifen eingeschlossen, mit mindestens einem Bestandteil hergestellt aus dieser Mischung
Examination procedure03.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/45]
21.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2005Fee for grant paid
01.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT02.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0829511  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5868880  (POUILLE GUY [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2224031  (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * example - *