Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1085796

EP1085796 - System used for cooling electronic equipments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.05.2003  [2003/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION
Broadcasting House
London W1A 1AA / GB
For all designated states
Trox (UK) Limited
Caxton Way, Thetford
Norfolk IP24 3SQ / GB
[2001/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, David Jonathan
2 Arlington Road
Teddington Middlesex TW11 8JN / GB
02 / Sams, Ian James
The Wims, Brook Road, Great Tey
Colchester Essex 006 1JG / GB
03 / Holland, Michael James
22 Hunters Oak
Watton, Thetford Norfolk, IP25 6HC / GB
04 / Fields, Simon David
33 Watermill Green
Thetford Norfolk IP24 3BW / GB
 [2001/12]
Representative(s)Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Moerser Straße 140
47803 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]DR. STARK & PARTNER
PATENTANWÄLTE Moerser Strasse 140
47803 Krefeld / DE
Application number, filing date00119882.913.09.2000
[2001/12]
Priority number, dateGB1999002159413.09.1999         Original published format: GB 9921594
[2001/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1085796
Date:21.03.2001
Language:DE
[2001/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1085796
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H02B1/56
[2002/01]
Former International [2001/12]H05K7/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/12]
TitleGerman:Kühlsystem zur Verwendung für die Kühlung elektronischer Ausrüstungen[2001/12]
English:System used for cooling electronic equipments[2001/12]
French:Système employé au refroissement des équipements électroniques[2001/12]
Examination procedure26.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2568712  (BULL SEMS [FR]) [X] 1-4,9,22-24 * page 2, lines 13-24 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, lines 20-28 * * page 10, lines 1-34 * * page 13, lines 14-20; figures 2A,6,9A,12 *;
 [A]GB2113012  (FLAEKT AB) [A] 1,9,22 * abstract *
 [X]  KOLTE J, "COOLING SYSTEM BPA 105 FOR SMALL TELEPHONE EXCHANGES", ERICSSON REVIEW,SE,ERICSSON. STOCKHOLM, (1989), vol. 66, no. 2, ISSN 0014-0171, pages 58 - 63, XP000048436 [X] 1-4,9,22-24 * page 3; figures 2,3 *