Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1058194

EP1058194 - Multiple level minimum logic network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2013
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reed, Coke S.
62 William Street
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
[2000/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Gill, David Alan
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]Gill, David Alan
W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date00120146.619.07.1996
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateUS1995050551321.07.1995         Original published format: US 505513
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1058194
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1058194
Date:10.03.2010
[2010/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/80, G06F15/173
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtiges Minimallogiknetzwerk[2000/49]
English:Multiple level minimum logic network[2000/49]
French:Réseau logique minimal à niveaux multiples[2000/49]
Examination procedure10.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
04.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/48]
23.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/48]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96924569.5  / EP0842473
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960924569) is  16.07.1999
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
20.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
31.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 15
07.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200712   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2007
31.07.200914   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2010
15.12.201217   M06   Not yet paid
31.07.201318   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US5313590  (TAYLOR STUART A [US]) [X] 2 * figures 1,1a, * * column 1, line 60 - line 65 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 9 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 13 * [A] 13-14,17-24 [I] 1,3-12,15-16,25-34;
 [XAI]  GBURZYNSKI P ET AL, "A simple and scalable architecture for rapidly expandable networks", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 1994. VOL. I: ARCHITECTURE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWENTY 19940104; 19940104 - 19940107 LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19940104), ISBN 978-0-8186-5050-5, pages 481 - 490, XP010096922 [X] 1-2 * page 482, column l, line 5 - column r, line 32 * * page 483, column r, line 40 - page 484, column l, line 50 * [A] 13-14,17-24 [I] 3-12,15-16,25-34

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HICSS.1994.323151
 [A]  ACAMPORA A S ET AL, "Performance analysis of hot-potato routing for multiclass traffic in multihop lightwave networks", ONE WORLD THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS. FLORENCE, MAY 4 - 8, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS (INFOCOM)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920504), vol. CONF. 11, ISBN 978-0-7803-0602-8, pages 644 - 655, XP010062196 [A] 1,27,34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1992.263470
 [A]  RAVIKUMAR C P ET AL, "Star-Graph based multistage interconnection network for ATM switch fabric", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED PROCESSING, 1994. PROCEEDINGS. SIXTH IEEE SYM POSIUM ON DALLAS, TX, USA 26-29 OCT. 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19941026), ISBN 978-0-8186-6427-4, pages 444 - 451, XP010100155 [A] 8,31-32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPDP.1994.346136