EP1092611 - Hydrostatic vehicle steering system with supplemental charge pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yifei, Raymond Hou 1129 Lantern Square No.3 Waterloo, IA 50701 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Lau-Loskill, Philipp, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Lau-Loskill, Philipp, Dipl.-Phys., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120619.2 | 21.09.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | US19990417925 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: US 417925 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1092611 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092611 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D11/18 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B62D11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydrostatische Fahrzeuglenkung mit Zusatzpumpe | [2001/16] | English: | Hydrostatic vehicle steering system with supplemental charge pump | [2001/16] | French: | Dispositif de direction hydrostatique pour véhicule avec une pompe additionnelle | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1157945 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [A] 1-3 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 11 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A]GB2058300 (HAINAUT SAMBRE SA) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 73 - page 1, line 103 *; | [A]EP0627335 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 2,4 * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 46 ** column 7, line 3 - column 7, line 14 * | Examination | US4649705 | US4955442 | by applicant | US5390751 | US5948029 |