EP1089211 - Method and apparatus for displaying gene expression patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states HITACHI SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Hitachi Software Engineering Co., Ltd. 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozaki, Yasuyuki Hitachi Software Eng. Co., Ltd., 6-81, Onoe-cho Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | 02 /
Nakashige, Ryo Hitachi Software Eng. Co., Ltd., 6-81, Onoe-cho Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Tsunehiko Hitachi Software Eng. Co., Ltd., 6-81, Onoe-cho Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | 04 /
Tamura, Takuro Hitachi Software Eng. Co., Ltd., 6-81, Onoe-cho Naka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121116.8 | 28.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990277918 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 27791899 | JP20000088695 | 28.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000088695 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1089211 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1089211 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | [2003/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1089211 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
G16B40/00 (EP,US);
G06F18/23 (EP,US);
G16B25/10 (EP,US);
G16B45/00 (EP,US);
G06V2201/04 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Darstellung von Gen-Expressionsmustern | [2001/14] | English: | Method and apparatus for displaying gene expression patterns | [2001/14] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de visualisation de configurations d'expression génique | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5889523 (WILCOX LYNN D [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * column 2, line 27 - line 41 * * figure 10 *; | [A] - DAS G ET AL, "Rule discovery from time series", PROCEEDINGS FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY AND DATA MINING, NEW YORK, NY, USA, 27-31 AUG. 1998, 1998, Menlo Park, CA, USA, AAAI Press, USA, ISBN 1-57735-070-7, pages 16 - 22, XP002237959 [A] 1-11 * page 16, column 1 * * page 16, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 17, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [A] - KEOGH E J ET AL, "Scaling up dynamic time warping to massive dataset", PRINCIPLES OF DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY. THIRD EUROPEAN CONFERENCE, PKDD'99. PROCEEDINGS. (LECTURE NOTES IN ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE VOL.1704), PRINCIPLES OF DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY. THIRD EUROPEAN CONFERENCE, PKDD'99, PRAGUE, CZ, 1999, Berlin, Germany, Springer-Verlag, Germany, ISBN 3-540-66490-4, pages 1 - 11, XP002237960 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1 - page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * | [D] - EISEN M B ET AL, "Cluster analysis and display of genome-wide expression patterns", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199812), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14863 - 14868, XP002140966 [D] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.25.14863 | [Y] - HOFMAN I ET AL, "Robust and efficient cluster analysis using a shared near neighbours approach", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BRISBANE, QLD., AUSTRALIA 16-20 AUG. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980816), ISBN 0-8186-8512-3, pages 243 - 247, XP010297567 [Y] 12-15 * page 243, column R - page 244, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1998.711126 | [A] - "DESCRIPTION OF PIROUETTE ALGORITHMS", CHEMOMETRICS TECHNICAL NOTE, XX, XX, (1993), pages 1 - 4, XP002927703 [A] 12-15 * page 1; figure 1 * |