Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1089341

EP1089341 - Non-volatile memory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM CO., LTD.
21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
ROHM CO., LTD.
21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakamura, Takashi, c/o ROHM CO., LTD.
21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
 [2001/14]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00121187.929.09.2000
[2001/14]
Priority number, dateJP1999028023730.09.1999         Original published format: JP 28023799
[2001/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1089341
Date:04.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1089341
Date:22.08.2001
[2001/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/115
[2001/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/21]
Former [2001/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nichtflüchtiger Speicher[2001/14]
English:Non-volatile memory[2001/14]
French:Mémoire non volatile[2001/14]
Examination procedure14.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
18.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/38]
10.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200910   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5541871  (NISHIMURA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,10,11 * figure 7 * * column 7, line 1 - line 22 *;
 [A]US5365094  (TAKASU HIDEMI [JP]) [A] 1-3,8 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 64 *;
 [A]WO9926252  (ROHM CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,8 * figures 1-5,12 *;
 [PA]EP1031989  (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-5,8 * figures 1-5,12 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0046] - [0051] *;
 [A]DE19739673  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,8 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 25 *;
 [A]JPH0851165  ;
 [PA]EP1024524  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 9 * paragraph [0003] *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, [A] 6,7,10,11 * abstract *
by applicantUS5541871
 US5365094