blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1091206

EP1091206 - Method and apparatus for the optical measurement of coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/20]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Voyé, Christian
Habichtstrasse 5b
58285 Gevelsberg / DE
02 / Rupieper, Paul
Eibenweg 18
42111 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Cramm, Joachim
Wilhelm-Brockhaus-Weg 49
42327 Wuppertal / DE
 [2001/15]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/15]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00121207.529.09.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateDE1999104875209.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19948752
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091206
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091206
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091206
Date:12.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/57, G01N21/84
[2001/15]
CPC:
G01N21/89 (EP,US); G01N21/57 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Messung von Überzugsschichten[2001/15]
English:Method and apparatus for the optical measurement of coatings[2001/15]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la mesure optique des revêtements[2001/15]
Examination procedure05.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
13.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT29.09.2004
LU29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
PT12.10.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT29.09.2004
LU29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2007/08]CY12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT29.09.2004
LU29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2006/12]FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/45]FI12.05.2004
GB12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI12.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE12.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE2525701  (HERBERTS & CO GMBH DR KURT);
 [DA]DE3638932  (KAEMMERER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,8 * column 5, line 32 - line 53; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5590560  (JOOS FELIPE M [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 11, line 16 - line 36; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.