EP1090614 - Eye pillow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayaba-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igaki, Michihito, Kao Corp. Research Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Oka, Takeshi, Kao Corp. Research Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 03 /
Tokunaga, Tadayuki, Kao Corp.Research Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Shinichi, Kao Corp. Research Lab. 1-3, Bunka 2-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121280.2 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | JP19990287435 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28743599 | JP19990371966 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37196699 | JP20000269305 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000269305 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1090614 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1090614 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090614 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
A61F7/03 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0062 (EP,US);
A61F2007/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/12] |
Former [2001/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Augenpolster | [2001/15] | English: | Eye pillow | [2001/15] | French: | Coussin pour les yeux | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 28.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5233981 (MIYASHITA EIJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]DE29804424U (VOS EMMELINE [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 1, paragraph 4 *; | [A]DE29710493U (SIEVERS GABRIELE [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 4 *; | [PA]WO9951174 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * column W * |