Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091410

EP1091410 - Solid state imaging device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.10.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.11.2011  [2011/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/11]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
No. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toma, Tetsuo
c/o Fuji Film Microdevices Co., Ltd. 1-6, Matsuzakadaira, Taiwa-cho
Kurokawa-gun, Miyagi / JP
 [2010/49]
Former [2001/15]01 / Toma, Tetsuo, c/o Fuji Film Microdevices Co., Ltd.
1-6, Matsuzakadaira, Taiwa-cho
Kurokawa-gun, Miyagi / JP
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date00121320.609.10.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateJP1999028873108.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28873199
JP1999028873208.10.1999         Original published format: JP 28873299
[2001/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1091410
Date:11.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1091410
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1091410
Date:08.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/148
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/36]
Former [2001/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Festkörper-Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und ihr Herstellungsverfahren[2001/15]
English:Solid state imaging device and method of manufacturing the same[2001/15]
French:Capteur d'image à l'état solide et son procédé de fabrication[2001/15]
Examination procedure12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
24.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2010Fee for grant paid
13.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06013855.9  / EP1710837
EP06013856.7  / EP1710838
Opposition(s)09.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS61244063  ;
 [X]US5907356  (MORIMOTO MICHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 2,5,6 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 44; figures 7A-7D *;
 [A]US4602289  (SEKINE HIROKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 6, line 49 - line 59 * * column 7, line 9 - line 68; figure 9 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870324), vol. 011, no. 092, Database accession no. (E - 491), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - TANABE A ET AL, "DYNAMIC RANGE IMPROVEMENT BY NARROW-CHANNEL EFFECT SUPPRESSION AND SMEAR REDUCTION TECHNOLOGIES IN SMALL PIXEL IT-CCD IMAGE SENSORS", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 1998. IEDM TECHNICAL DIGEST. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, DEC. 6 - 9, 1998, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19981206), ISBN 0-7803-4775-7, pages 41 - 44, XP000859317 [X] 2,5,6 * the whole document *