Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096101

EP1096101 - Ladder hinge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KRAUSE-WERK GMBH & CO. KG
Industriegebiet Altenburg
D-36304 Alsfeld-Altenburg / DE
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Krause, Günther
Porschestrasse 9
36304 Alsfeld / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Böck, Bernhard , et al
advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Strasse 6
35390 Giessen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/44]Böck, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Böck Tappe Kollegen, Patent-und Rechtsanwälte, Ludwigsplatz 9
35390 Giessen / DE
Former [2001/18]Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43
35390 Giessen / DE
Application number, filing date00121423.829.09.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateDE1999219004U29.10.1999         Original published format: DE 29919004 U
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096101
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096101
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:E06C1/32, E06C7/08
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Leitergelenk[2001/18]
English:Ladder hinge[2001/18]
French:Articulation pour échelle[2001/18]
Examination procedure26.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
08.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
PT31.08.2004
AT29.09.2004
LU29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/08]CY31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
AT29.09.2004
LU29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2006/12]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
AT29.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
BE30.09.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
MC30.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI31.03.2004
IE31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
Former [2005/18]FI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19539157  (HYMER LEICHTMETALLBAU [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - line 57; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE19517227  (BRENNENSTUHL KG HUGO [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]EP0822317  (IG CORP COMPANY LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - line 36; figure 4B *;
 [A]DE4344921  (RAUSCHENBERGER METALLWAREN GMB [DE]) [A] 4-6,18,19 * column 1, line 46 - line 58; figures 7,8 * * column 5, line 4 - line 18 *;
 [A]DE3737295  (KRAUSE WERK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 7-11 * column 3, line 36 - line 55; figure - * * column 4, line 42 - line 64 *