Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1092455

EP1092455 - Snowboard boot binding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho, Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Toshiyuki
1074-4, Fukaishimizu-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2001/16]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Former [2001/16]Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59
81476 München / DE
Application number, filing date00121594.602.10.2000
[2001/16]
Priority number, dateUS1999041900313.10.1999         Original published format: US 419003
[2001/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1092455
Date:18.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1092455
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1092455
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:A63C9/08
[2001/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2003/22]
Former [2001/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bindung für Snowboardstiefel[2001/16]
English:Snowboard boot binding[2001/16]
French:Fixation de chaussure pour planche à neige[2001/16]
Examination procedure16.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
24.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2005Fee for grant paid
13.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9716227  (EMERY SOC [FR], et al) [X] 1-11,13-25 * figures 1-4 * * page 3, line 7 - line 11; figures 1,2 * * page 5, line 2 - line 3; figure 4 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 12;
 [Y]FR2734165  (TYROLIA FREIZEITGERAETE [AT]) [Y] 12 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 32; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0712646  (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 18-22 * figures 32-A * * figures 32-C *