Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1091051

EP1091051 - Device for delivering carbonated drinking water from a faucet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/15]Method and device for delivering carbonated drinking water from a fancet
[2001/37]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[2002/06]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
Linde Gas Aktiengesellschaft
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stoltze, Björn, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Isarbach 9
85764 Oberschleissheim / DE
02 / Schmidtke, Wolfgang
Fürstenallee 12
33102 Paderborn / DE
 [2001/15]
Application number, filing date00121675.304.10.2000
[2001/15]
Priority number, dateDE199914782005.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19947820
[2001/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1091051
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:E03C1/046, A23L2/54, C02F1/68, B01F3/04
[2001/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von carbonisiertem Trinkwasser über einen Wasserhahn[2001/15]
English:Device for delivering carbonated drinking water from a faucet[2001/37]
French:Dispositif pour la distribution d'eau carbonisée,par le biais d'un robinet[2001/37]
Former [2001/15]Method and device for delivering carbonated drinking water from a fancet
Former [2001/15]Procéder et dispositif pour dégager d'eau carbonisé sur un robinet
Examination procedure11.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/45]
20.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19715958  (DUESSELDORF STADTWERKE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 23FF; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]GB340503  (ERNST COHNITZ) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 15FF; figure . *;
 [PA]WO0027515  (SPIEGEL MARGRET [DE]) [PA] 1,6 * page 1, line 2FF; figures 3,4 *