EP1092667 - Automatic winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/16] | Automatic winder and its winding unit | ||
[2005/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Murata Kikai Kabushiki Kaisha 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kono, Satoru Murata Kikai Shataku B-201, 51-6, Motoyashiki Makishima-cho, Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Tanigawa, Yasunobu 1-335-gou, 42-1, Kusauchi Hanshowari Kyotanabe-shi / JP | [2005/21] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
Koni, Satoru Murata Kikai Shataku B-201, 51-6, Motoyashiki Makishima-cho, Uji-shi, Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Tanigawa, Yasunobu 1-335-gou, 42-1, Kusauchi Hanshowari Kyotanabe-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121696.9 | 04.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | JP19990290822 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29082299 | JP19990290823 | 13.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29082399 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1092667 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1092667 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1092667 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/72, B65H54/70 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
B65H54/70 (EP);
B65H54/72 (EP);
B65H2407/30 (EP);
B65H2601/321 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2003/11] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Wickelmaschine | [2005/13] | English: | Automatic winder | [2005/13] | French: | Bobinoir automatique | [2005/13] |
Former [2001/16] | Automatische Wickelmaschine und ihre Aufspuleinheit | ||
Former [2001/16] | Automatic winder and its winding unit | ||
Former [2001/16] | Bobinoir automatique et son unité de bobinage | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 24.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05017384.8 / EP1616827 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1228633 (ELITEX ZAVODY TEXTILNIHO STROJIRENSTVI) [X] 5,6 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [A]CH660872 (MAYER TEXTILMASCHF) [A] 1,2,5* page 3, column L, line 10 - line 29 *; | [AX]DE4438346 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * [X] 5 |