Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103350

EP1103350 - Machine tool with electromagnet for mounting on a ferromagnetic workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.01.2010  [2010/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. & E. Fein GmbH
Hans-Fein-Strasse 81
73529 Schwäbisch-Gmünd-Bargau / DE
[2006/24]
Former [2004/48]For all designated states
C. & E. Fein GmbH
Hans-Fein-Strasse 81
73529 Schwäbisch-Gmünd-Bargau / DE
Former [2004/15]For all designated states
C. & E. FEIN GmbH
Leuschnerstrasse 43
70176 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
C. & E. Fein Gmbh & Co. KG
Leuschnerstrasse 41-47
70176 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kress, Christof
Öhrwiesenweg 11
73779 Deizisau / DE
02 / Beichter, Martin
Wildermuthweg 16
70197 Stuttgart / DE
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Gahlert, Stefan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Gahlert, Stefan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2001/22]Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00121732.205.10.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateDE199915615523.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19956155
[2001/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1103350
Date:30.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1103350
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103350
Date:28.01.2009
Language:DE
[2009/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B25H1/00
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2002/37]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Werkzeugmaschine mit einem Elektromagneten zur Befestigung an einem ferromagnetischen Werkstück[2001/22]
English:Machine tool with electromagnet for mounting on a ferromagnetic workpiece[2001/22]
French:Machine-outil avec électro-aimant pour la fixation à une pièce ferromagnétique[2001/22]
Examination procedure12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
16.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2008Fee for grant paid
15.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/01]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.03.2008Request for further processing filed
14.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.04.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3371257  (WARREN WESLEY S, et al) [X] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 24; figure 5 * [Y] 5;
 [X]JPS57184614  ;
 [X]US2932194  (BUCK EUGENE W) [X] 1,6,7 * column 4, lines 52-70; figure 9 *;
 [YA]US5126643  (FRENCH EDWARD M [GB]) [Y] 5 * figure 3; claim 10 * [A] 1
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830205), vol. 007, no. 029, Database accession no. (M - 191), [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicantUS3371257