Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099697

EP1099697 - Process for the preparation of alkali salts of L-ascorbic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Burst, Wolfram
Illerstrasse 7
68199 Mannheim / DE
02 / Kaibel, Gerd, Dr.
Robert-Bosch-Strasse 4
68623 Lampertheim / DE
03 / Böttcher, Andreas, Dr.
Konrad-Adenauer-Ring 38
69226 Nussloch / DE
04 / Kessler, Veronique
Neuwiesenstrasse 28
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
05 / Kuntze, Thomas, Dr.
Oberkreuzstrasse 34
67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE
 [2001/20]
Application number, filing date00121999.710.10.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateDE199915451112.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19954511
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099697
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/62
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkalisalzen der L-Ascorbinsäure[2001/20]
English:Process for the preparation of alkali salts of L-ascorbic acid[2001/20]
French:Procédé de préparation de sels alkalins de l'acide L-ascorbique[2001/20]
Examination procedure16.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
12.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0133493  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-10,12 * page 7 *;
 [YD]EP0671405  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [YD] 1-10,12 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP0403351  (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [Y] 1-10,12 * examples 7,8 *;
 [A]GB1222322  (POLITECHNIKA SLASKA IM WINCENT [PL]) [A] 1-17 * examples III,IV *