Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096461

EP1096461 - Motion system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Defence Electronics GmbH
Brüggeweg 54
28309 Bremen / DE
[2004/20]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
28305 Bremen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wilkens, Rolf
Weissenburger Strasse 24
28211 Bremen / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2008/28]Thul, Hermann
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/18]Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys.
Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00122007.809.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateDE199915191928.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19951919
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096461
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096461
Date:03.06.2009
[2009/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096461
Date:02.05.2012
Language:DE
[2012/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09B9/04, // G09B9/12
[2009/23]
Former International [2001/18]G09B9/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Bewegungssystem[2001/18]
English:Motion system[2001/18]
French:Système à mouvement[2001/18]
Examination procedure06.11.2009Examination requested  [2009/51]
11.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2012Fee for grant paid
21.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2010
Opposition(s)05.02.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
IE09.10.2012
LU09.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/09]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
IE09.10.2012
AT31.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/35]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
IE09.10.2012
BE31.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/33]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
IE09.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/24]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
MC31.10.2012
Former [2013/08]CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2013/01]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
PT03.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
GR03.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
Former [2012/48]FI02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19542869  (STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column A *;
 [A]DE19807197  (STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3436841  (WHITMORE HENRY B, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3643445  (FOERST REINER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * columns 1-3; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]FR2677155  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-11 * pages 1-3; figure 1 *