Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095717

EP1095717 - Method and device for hydromechanical deep drawing of metal sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schuler SMG GmbH & Co. KG
Louis-Schuler-Strasse 1
68753 Waghäusel / DE
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Kolleck, Ralf B., Dr. Ing.
Kirschenweg 9
47804 Krefeld / DE
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Lichti, Heiner
Lichti - Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date00122059.911.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateDE199915210529.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19952105
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095717
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095717
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21D22/20
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/38]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum hydromechanischen Tiefziehen von Metallblech[2001/18]
English:Method and device for hydromechanical deep drawing of metal sheet[2001/18]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour l' emboutissage profond hydromécanique de tôles[2001/18]
Examination procedure20.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
03.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
18.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/14]
17.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS5956926  ;
 [YA]DE19624036  (KLEINER MATTHIAS PROF DR ING [DE]) [Y] 2-4,6-9 * claims 3,5 * [A] 1,5
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840725), vol. 008, no. 160, Database accession no. (M - 312), [X] 1,5 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,6-9