Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098250

EP1098250 - Cache using multiple logical ring units [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMC CORPORATION
35 Parkwood Drive
Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Lambright, Daniel
12 Green Street, Unit 3
Watertown, MA 02472 / US
02 / Ofer, Adi
96 Washburn Avenue
Wellesley, MA 02481 / US
03 / Vishlitzky, Natan
87 Clinton Road
Brookline, MA 02445 / US
04 / Ofek, Yuval
20 Lantern Road
Framingham, MA 01702 / US
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Werinherstrasse 79
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26
80331 München / DE
Former [2001/19]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Mozartstrasse 8
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00122213.216.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateUS1999043461105.11.1999         Original published format: US 434611
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098250
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/08
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/05]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Cache-Speicher mit mehreren logischen Ring-Einheiten[2001/19]
English:Cache using multiple logical ring units[2001/19]
French:Antémémoire ayant plusieurs unités logiques annulaires[2001/19]
Examination procedure20.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
10.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
22.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
13.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.12.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.12.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4371929  (BRANN JOHN J, et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,12-14,20-22,24,25 * column 2, line 40 - line 68 * * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 7 * * column 10, line 51 - line 61 * * column 18, line 44 - line 61; figures 1,3,5,8,9 * [Y] 7,15,23,26;
 [Y]EP0497543  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 7,15,23,26 * column 7, line 35 - column 8, line 12; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]  KRASTINS, "Cache memories quicken access to disk data", ELECTRONIC DESIGN., PENTON PUBLISHING, CLEVELAND, OH., US, (19820513), vol. 30, no. 10, ISSN 0013-4872, pages SS41 - SS44, XP000211556 [A] 8,16,27 * page SS42, column R, line 12 - line 34 *