Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094547

EP1094547 - Electrical connector with strain relief [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCI
145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/01]For all designated states
FCI
145-147 rue Yves Le Coz
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V.
Helftheuvelweg 11
5202 CB'S-Hertogenbosch / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Hahn, Marlyn E.
3065 Crooked Wind Lane
York, Pennsylvania 17404 / US
02 / Kline, Stanley A.
312 Juniper Drive
Etters, Pennsylvania 17319 / US
03 / Shuey, Joseph B.
3425 Logan Street
Camp Hill, Pennsylvania 17011 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstraße 10
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00122278.519.10.2000
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateUS19990160482P19.10.1999         Original published format: US 160482 P
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1094547
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1094547
Date:04.10.2001
[2001/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094547
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/02, H01R12/04
[2001/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/26]
Former [2001/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Electrischer Steckverbinder mit Zugentlastungvorrichtung[2001/17]
English:Electrical connector with strain relief[2001/17]
French:Connecteur électrique avec atténuation de la traction[2001/17]
Examination procedure25.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/14]
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2005Fee for grant paid
25.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03019503.6  / EP1376763
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Former [2007/34]IT19.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9744859  (TESSERA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,14-17,19,21,22 * abstract * * page 21, line 18 - line 27 * * page 23, line 23 - page 24, line 19 * * page 25, line 27 - page 27, line 6 * [A] 8,14;
 [X]WO9743885  (E TEC AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,17 * abstract * * page 8, line 10 - page 11, line 9 *;
 [A]US5919050  (KEHLEY GLENN LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 19 *;
 [A]JPH08125379  ;
 [A]US5810607  (SHIH DA-YUAN [US], et al) [A] 23 * abstract * * column 2, lines 48-59 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 25 *;
 [A]US5934914  (FJELSTAD JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 23 * abstract * * column 7, line 58 - column 10, line 29 *;
 [A]US4217024  (ALDRIDGE LIONEL D [US], et al) [A] 23,26,27,29,30 * abstract * * column 2, lines 48-50 - column 2, lines 54-59 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 25 *;
 [A]EP0651471  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 29 * abstract * * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 18 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, [A] 3,12,18 * abstract *