Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095580

EP1095580 - Method for manufacturing a boot made of synthetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/18]Boot made of synthetic material and method for manufacturing it
[2005/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MYTYM S.R.L.
Piazza Giorgione, 64/C
31033 Castelfranco Veneto (Treviso) / IT
[2003/08]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Dag Horses S.r.l.
Piazza Giorgione, 64/C
31033 Castelfranco Veneto (Treviso) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Cavallin, Camillo
Via Spada, 145/A
31050 Fanzolo di Vedelago (Treviso) / IT
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2001/18]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00122342.923.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateIT1999TV0011425.10.1999         Original published format: IT TV990114
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1095580
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095580
Date:03.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A43B7/12, A43B23/06, B29D31/505, B29D31/50, B29D31/515, B29D31/518
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
Extension statesAL25.10.2001
MK25.10.2001
RO25.10.2001
SI25.10.2001
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Stiefels aus Kunststoff[2005/01]
English:Method for manufacturing a boot made of synthetic material[2005/01]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une botte en matériau synthétique[2005/01]
Former [2001/18]Stiefel aus Kunststoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung
Former [2001/18]Boot made of synthetic material and method for manufacturing it
Former [2001/18]Botte en matériau synthétique et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure25.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
06.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2005Fee for grant paid
24.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200405   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
FR03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
CY23.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GB03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/40]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
CY23.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
FR31.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GB03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/20]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
CY23.10.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GB03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/11]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GB03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/08]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
IE24.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/48]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
IE24.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/30]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
MC31.10.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/26]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT03.08.2005
BE03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT03.08.2005
CH03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
LI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT03.08.2005
FI03.08.2005
SE03.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US5647150  (ROMANATO MARIAROSA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [XA]FR2116790  (LABELLE ET CIE) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 7,12;
 [XA]WO9814081  (STEFCOM SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 7,13;
 [X]EP0792595  (GORE W L & ASS SRL [IT]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2249940  (CALDWELL KENNETH) [A] 1,6,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0793921  (NORDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,12 * the whole document *