Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095671

EP1095671 - Laser irradiation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maki, Shin, c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha
1500, Inokuchi, Nakai-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 259-0151 / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00122371.825.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999030507827.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30507899
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095671
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095671
Date:10.12.2003
[2003/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1095671
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Apparat zur Laserbestrahlung[2001/18]
English:Laser irradiation apparatus[2001/18]
French:Appareil d'irradiation laser[2001/18]
Examination procedure13.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
31.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2006Fee for grant paid
10.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
CY30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
IE25.10.2006
LU25.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
GR01.12.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
IE25.10.2006
LU25.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
GR01.12.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2008/19]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
IE25.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
GR01.12.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/48]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
IE25.10.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/37]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
MC31.10.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/35]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
IT30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/28]AT30.08.2006
BE30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/26]AT30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
PT06.02.2007
Former [2007/23]AT30.08.2006
CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
DK30.11.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
Former [2007/19]CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
NL30.08.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
Former [2007/12]CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
SE30.11.2006
ES11.12.2006
Former [2007/09]CH30.08.2006
FI30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
SE30.11.2006
Former [2007/08]CH30.08.2006
LI30.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0947221  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-11 * paragraphs [0178] - [0206] * * figures 9,17-20 * [A] 3;
 [A]US4760840  (FOURNIER JR GEORGE R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 60 * * figures 5A,5B *;
 [A]WO8707133  (HYWEL DAVIES DAVID [GB]) [A] 3 * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * figure 3 *;
 [E]EP1075822  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,10 * abstract * * figure 6 *
by applicantWO9304727
 JPH06154239