blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1096418

EP1096418 - Error derived scores for detection systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Persay Inc., c/o Corporation Service Company
1013 Centre Road
Wilmington DE 19805 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Metzger, Yaakov
43 Poalei Harakevet Street
Givataim 53254 / IL
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/18]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00122382.525.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999042709826.10.1999         Original published format: US 427098
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096418
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096418
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/62, G10L17/00
[2004/03]
CPC:
G10L17/06 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2001/18]G06K9/62, G10L15/06
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/41]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fehlerabgeleitete Bewertung für Detektionssysteme[2001/18]
English:Error derived scores for detection systems[2001/18]
French:Valeurs d'évaluation dérivées avec des erreurs pour des systèmes de détection[2001/18]
Examination procedure04.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/49]
25.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - WEBB, ANDREW, Statistical Pattern Recognition, LONDON, ARNOLD PUBLISHERS, (1999), XP002261911 [X] 1-5 * page 6 - page 17 * * in particular pages 13/14, the Neyman-Pearson decision rule *
 [X]  - KROSCHEL, KRISTIAN, Statistische Nachrichtentheorie, erster Teil, BERLIN, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1986), XP002261937 [X] 1-5 * page 58 - page 62 *
 [X]  - NIKULIN V, "A Bayesian approach to object detection", NEURAL NETWORKS PROCEEDINGS, 1998. IEEE WORLD CONGRESS ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON ANCHORAGE, AK, USA 4-9 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980504), ISBN 0-7803-4859-1, pages 809 - 813, XP010286615 [X] 1-5 * sections 1 and 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.1998.685871
 [A]  - GONG Y, "EVALUATION OF BAYES DECISION APPROACH TO AUTOMATIC DETERMINATION OF THRESHOLDS FOR SPEAKER VERIFICATION", 4TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. EUROSPEECH '95. MADRID, SPAIN, SEPT. 18 - 21, 1995, EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. (EUROSPEECH), MADRID: GRAFICAS BRENS, ES, (19950918), vol. 1 CONF. 4, pages 367 - 370, XP000854726 [A] 1-5 * section 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.