blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1093727

EP1093727 - Reduced basis weight cigarette paper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schweitzer-Mauduit International, Inc.
100 North Point Center East, Suite 600
Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
Schweitzer-Mauduit International, Inc.
Suite 600, 100 North Point Center East
Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hampl, Vladimir, Jr.
160 Spring Ridge Trace
Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Bergmeier, Werner
Canzler & Bergmeier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date00122594.517.10.2000
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateUS1999042069819.10.1999         Original published format: US 420698
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1093727
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1093727
Date:27.06.2001
[2001/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1093727
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2001
ClassificationIPC:A24D1/02
[2001/17]
CPC:
A24D1/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/17]
TitleGerman:Zigarettenpapier mit reduziertem Flächengewicht[2001/17]
English:Reduced basis weight cigarette paper[2001/17]
French:Papier à cigarette à faible grammage[2001/17]
Examination procedure11.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/41]
07.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2005Fee for grant paid
31.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
CY17.10.2005
GB17.10.2005
IE17.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT14.11.2005
[2007/20]
Former [2007/08]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
GB17.10.2005
IE17.10.2005
LU31.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/48]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
IE17.10.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/30]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
MC31.10.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/26]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]BE08.06.2005
CH08.06.2005
LI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]BE08.06.2005
SE08.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE08.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5462400  ;
 [X]EP0842615  (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,12,15-18,20,21,28,31-33 * page 3, line 16 - line 18 * * page 4, line 18 - line 19 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0870871  (SCHWEITZER MAUDUIT INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-17,20-35 * claim - * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 44 * * column 8, line 9 - line 20 *;
 [D]US5893372  (HAMPL JR VLADIMIR [US]);
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 34, Database accession no. 1979-61972B, XP002165226 & JPS5462400 A 00000000 (GLATZ J GMBH) [A] 1-35 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.