Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094160

EP1094160 - Fluidized soil material supply machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOMATSU LTD.
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[2006/08]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
KOMATSU LTD.
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Yasuhiro, Construction Equipment Tech.
Center III, Komatsu Ltd., 3-20-1, Nakase
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
 [2001/17]
Representative(s)Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Fuchs
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2001/17]Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche
Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60
65036 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date00122650.518.10.2000
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateJP1999029961321.10.1999         Original published format: JP 29961399
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1094160
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1094160
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1094160
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:E02D3/12
[2003/01]
Former International [2001/17]E02F5/22
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2003/39]
Former [2001/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Maschine zum Zuführen von Verflüssigter Erde[2001/17]
English:Fluidized soil material supply machine[2001/17]
French:Machine de distribution de materiaux terreux fluidisés[2001/17]
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/17]
25.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2005Fee for grant paid
28.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE22.02.2006
FR22.02.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/13]BE22.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH11217821  ;
 [A]EP0915205  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0068] , [0069]; figures 8,25,26 *;
 [A]US4927293  (CAMPBELL RANDY P [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 61 - column 6, line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4164597  (SMITH CARL K [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, [A] 1 * abstract *