EP1093819 - Compound and composition for delivering active agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/17] | Compounds and compositions for delivering active agents | ||
[2005/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emisphere Technologies, Inc. 765 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591-6715 / US | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Emisphere Technologies, Inc. 765 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, New York 10591-6715 / US | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Emisphere Technologies, Inc. 15 Skyline Drive Hawthorne, NY 10532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leone-Bay, Andrea 20 Woodland Way Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / US | 02 /
Ho, Koc-Kan 104 Pheasant Run Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US | 03 /
Leipold, Harry R. 63 Town Green Drive Elmsford, New York 10523 / US | 04 /
Milstein, Sam J. 15 Beechtree Lane Larchmont, New York 20538 / US | 05 /
Sarrubi, Donald J. 18 Lawton Lane Bronxville, New York 10708 / US | 06 /
Wang, Eric 9930 Timberknoll Lane Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US | 07 /
Gschneider, David 44 Cerretta Street, 6 Stamford, Connecticut 06907 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [2001/17] | 01 /
Leone-Bay, Andrea 20 Woodland Way Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / US | ||
02 /
Ho, Koc-Kan 104 Pheasant Run Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US | |||
03 /
Leipold, Harry R. 63 Town Green Drive Elmsford, New York 10523 / US | |||
04 /
Milstein, Sam J. 15 Beechtree Lane Larchmont, New York 20538 / US | |||
05 /
Sarrubi, Donald J. 18 Lawton Lane Bronxville, New York 10708 / US | |||
06 /
Wang, Eric 8205 Featherhill Road, Apt. 302 Perryhall, Maryland 21128 / US | |||
07 /
Gschneider, David 44 Cerretta Street, 6 Stamford, Connecticut 06907 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122704.0 | 06.02.1998 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | US19970796336 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796336 | US19970796340 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796340 | US19970796338 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796338 | US19970797813 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797813 | US19970797816 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797816 | US19970797820 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797820 | US19970797100 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797100 | US19970796337 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796337 | US19970796334 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796334 | US19970796341 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796341 | US19970796339 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796339 | US19970797817 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 797817 | US19970796335 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: US 796335 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093819 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093819 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093819 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/29, A61K47/18, C07C229/00, C07C233/00 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61K38/27 (EP);
A61K38/29 (EP);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07C229/42 (EP);
C07C233/51 (EP);
C07C233/54 (EP);
C07C233/69 (EP);
C07C233/81 (EP);
C07C233/83 (EP);
C07C235/12 (EP);
C07C235/24 (EP);
C07C235/34 (EP);
C07C235/38 (EP);
C07C235/52 (EP);
C07C235/56 (EP);
C07C235/60 (EP);
C07C235/64 (EP);
C07C235/66 (EP);
C07C235/74 (EP);
C07C237/12 (EP);
C07C237/20 (EP);
C07C237/36 (EP);
C07C237/40 (EP);
C07C237/42 (EP);
C07C243/38 (EP);
C07C259/06 (EP);
C07C271/28 (EP);
C07C271/54 (EP);
C07D209/48 (EP);
C07D211/62 (EP);
C07D213/81 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D241/24 (EP);
C07D257/04 (EP);
C07D295/192 (EP);
C07D311/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | A61K38/29, A61K47/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | Verbindung und Arzneizusammensetzung zur Verabreichung von Wirkstoffen | [2005/41] | English: | Compound and composition for delivering active agents | [2005/41] | French: | Composé et composition pour l'administration d'agents actifs | [2005/41] |
Former [2001/17] | Verbindungen und Arzneizusammensetzungen zur Verabreichung von Wirkstoffen | ||
Former [2001/17] | Compounds and compositions for delivering active agents | ||
Former [2001/17] | Composés et compositions pour l'administration d'agents actifs | Examination procedure | 18.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98905042.2 / EP1015008 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980905042) is 26.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2006/13] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.05.2006 | [2018/24] |
Former [2018/02] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
Former [2009/40] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
Former [2008/04] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 03.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576941 (NISSHIN FLOUR MILLING CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [A]WO9612473 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim - *; | [AP]WO9736480 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-14* claim - * |