Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1095902

EP1095902 - Method for generating a CO and H2-containing gas for the heat treatment of metallic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde AG
Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[2002/06]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Linde Gas Aktiengesellschaft
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kleinpass, Bernd
Wolfratshauser Strasse 44
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
02 / Strigl, Reinhard
Zeitlerstrasse 1
80995 München / DE
03 / Mahlo, Thomas
Edelweissweg 34
82538 Geretsried / DE
 [2001/18]
Application number, filing date00122770.119.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateDE199915151926.10.1999         Original published format: DE 19951519
[2001/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1095902
Date:02.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1095902
Date:28.11.2001
[2001/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/38, C21D1/76, C01B3/36, C23C8/20
[2001/48]
Former International [2001/18]C01B3/36, C23C8/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erzeugung von CO- und H2-haltigem Behandlungsgas für die Wärmebehandlung von metallischem Gut[2001/18]
English:Method for generating a CO and H2-containing gas for the heat treatment of metallic material[2001/18]
French:Méthode de génération d'un gaz contenant CO et H2 pour le traitement thermique d'un matériau métallique[2001/18]
Examination procedure02.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
12.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE4343927  (LINDE AG [DE]) [DX] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [DX]DE2000060  (MAAG ZAHNRAEDER & MASCHINEN AG) [DX] 1 * example 1 *;
 [X]WO9935082  (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 34 - page 12, line 20 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE4308803  (LEYBOLD DURFERRIT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0439614  (VNI PK I T I ELEKTROTERMICHESK [SU]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 45 - line 57 * * page 6, line 1 - line 26 *