Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1094472

EP1094472 - Conductive composition, conductive adhesive, and their mounting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/17]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Amami, Kazuyoshi
1724-26, Nagaokitamachi 2-chome
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 5783-0161 / JP
02 / Igaki, Emiko
36-21, Tomatsucho 4-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0003 / JP
03 / Itagaki, Minehiro
16-3, Dainichihigashimachi
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0016 / JP
 [2001/28]
Former [2001/17]01 / Amami, Kazuyoshi
46-4-102, Yamadaikehigashimachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0165 / JP
02 / Igaki, Emiko
36-21, Tomatsucho 4-chome
Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0003 / JP
03 / Itagaki, Minehiro
16-3, Dainichihigashimachi
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0016 / JP
Representative(s)Merkle, Gebhard
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/17]Merkle, Gebhard
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date00122920.220.10.2000
[2001/17]
Priority number, dateJP1999030053422.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30053499
[2001/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1094472
Date:25.04.2001
Language:EN
[2001/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1094472
Date:15.01.2003
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01B1/22, C09J11/04, C09J9/02, H05K3/32
[2003/03]
Former International [2001/17]H01B1/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/40]
Former [2001/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leitfähige Zusammensetzung, leitfähiger Klebstoff und Befestigungsstruktur[2001/17]
English:Conductive composition, conductive adhesive, and their mounting structure[2001/17]
French:Composition conductrice , adhesif conducteur et structure de montage[2001/17]
Examination procedure14.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/16]
21.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/27]
31.05.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.06.2006
31.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.06.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200203   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5183591  (AKAHOSHI SUMIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * column W * [A] 6,13,17