Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1108492

EP1108492 - Method and device for connecting the ends of metal strips by resistance welding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.2006  [2006/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sundwig GmbH
Stephanopeler Strasse 22
58675 Hemer / DE
For all designated states
A.I. WELDERS LIMITED
Seafield Road Inverness, IV1 1LZ
Scotland / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/25]For all designated states
Sundwig GmbH
Stephanopeler Strasse 22
58675 Hemer / DE
For all designated states
A.I. WELDERS LIMITED
Seafield Road
Inverness, IV1 1LZ, Scotland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Boguslawsky, Klaus
Heidestrasse 19b
58640 Iserlohn / DE
02 / McKenzie, Ian
Höhenweg 1
58706 Menden / DE
03 / Cossar, Harry
Druimeader, Stratherrick Road
Inverness IV2 4LQ / GB
04 / Sherriffs, Neill
22 Cuthbert Road, Culcabock
Inverness IV2 3RU / GB
 [2001/25]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/25]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00122926.921.10.2000
[2001/25]
Priority number, dateDE199916135117.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19961351
[2001/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1108492
Date:20.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1108492
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23K11/00, B23K37/04, B23K11/11, B21C47/24
[2002/46]
Former International [2001/25]B23K11/00, B23K37/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden der Enden von Metallbändern mittels Widerstandsschweissen[2001/25]
English:Method and device for connecting the ends of metal strips by resistance welding[2001/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le soudage bout à bout des extrémités de bandes métalliques par soudage par résistance[2001/25]
Examination procedure14.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
01.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/52]
11.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3815069  (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7,9,18 * Zusammenfassung;; figures 2-3A *;
 [Y]EP0865860  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7,9,18 * page 5, line 31 - line 36; figures 1,14 *;
 [A]AU2952271  (NATIONAL CAN CORP.) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1690377  (EMERSON PUGH) [A] 1,2 * page 1, column R, paragraph L - page 2, column L, paragraph 1; figure 2 *