Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098175

EP1098175 - Filling level indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MANN+HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
For all designated states
Stabil Group International GmbH
Hans-Böckler-Strasse 15
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
[2008/03]
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
MANN+HUMMEL GmbH
Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
For all designated states
Stabil Elektronik GmbH
Fritz-Müller-Strasse 143
73730 Esslingen / DE
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Solvay Automotive GmbH
Grubenweg 22
38667 Bad Harzburg / DE
For all designated states
Stabil Elektronik GmbH
Fritz-Müller-Strasse 143
73730 Esslingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Striegel, Klaus
Kirchdorfer Strasse 220
21109 Hamburg / DE
02 / Frank, Wolfgang
Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 4 1/2
83052 Bruckmühl / DE
03 / Liekefett, Klaus
Katzenwiesenring 117 A
38259 Salzgitter / DE
04 / Mohrmann, Klaus
Mahlestrasse 47
70794 Filderstadt / DE
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Seyboth, Matthias , et al
Mann+Hummel International GmbH & Co. KG
Schwieberdinger Straße 126
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]Seyboth, Matthias , et al
Mann+Hummel GmbH Patentabteilung VR-P Hindenburgstraße 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [2009/49]Voth, Gerhard , et al
Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [2006/44]Voth, Gerhard , et al
MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Hindenburgstrasse 45
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
Former [2002/27]Gosmann, Martin, Dr. , et al
Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung Postfach 220
30002 Hannover / DE
Former [2001/19]Lauer, Dieter, Dr. , et al
Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20
30173 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date00122952.521.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateDE199915321605.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19953216
[2001/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098175
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/16, G01F23/18
[2014/24]
Former International [2001/19]G01F23/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Füllstandsmessgerät[2001/19]
English:Filling level indicator[2001/19]
French:Détecteur de niveau[2001/19]
Examination procedure09.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
09.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/16]
27.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
16.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201415   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4335608  (WOOD RUSSELL J, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4358956  (RUBEN SAMUEL, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 15 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]DE8802675U  (HENKEL WOLFGANG E) [DA] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph L; figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]DE2909609  (DENKI ONKYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * page 9, line 28 - page 12, line 4; figures 1,2,7,8 *;
 [DA]DE3640942  (NIHON RADIATOR CO [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 68 - column 8, line 53; figures 1-6 *