Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1199335 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1199335



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 240
26.10.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.10.2010 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 1
02.12.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
02.12.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.12.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.11.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.11.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.11.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
13.08.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.08.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 7
07.08.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 7
07.07.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.05.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
08.05.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
07.05.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
05.05.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
05.03.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.03.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.01.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
05.01.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
05.01.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
11.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
11.09.2008 Description Search / examination 9
11.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.07.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.06.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 7
27.06.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 7
23.06.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.06.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.10.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.09.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 23
19.01.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.01.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
05.01.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
03.03.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
03.03.2004 Description Search / examination 9
03.03.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.10.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 1
06.10.2003 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 1
15.05.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
29.04.2002 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
13.03.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 European search report Search / examination 2
16.03.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Miscellaneous requests for changes concerning the applicant Search / examination 6
22.02.2001 Request for assignment Search / examination 16
19.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
21.10.2000 Description Search / examination 8
21.10.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6