blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1097773

EP1097773 - Process and apparatus for electric discharge machining [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A.
8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Case Postale 373
1217 Meyrin 1 / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A.
8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Case Postale 373
1217 Meyrin 1 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Balleys, Francois
139, Route du Mandemant
1242 Satigny / CH
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Micheli & Cie SA
Rue de Genève 122
Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thônex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Micheli & Cie
Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thonex / CH
Application number, filing date00122962.423.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateCH1999000202605.11.1999         Original published format: CH 202699
[2001/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1097773
Date:09.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1097773
Date:29.01.2003
Language:FR
[2003/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:B23H1/02, B23H7/04
[2001/19]
CPC:
B23H7/04 (EP,US); B23H1/00 (KR); B23H1/022 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/05]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Funkenerosionsbearbeitung[2002/35]
English:Process and apparatus for electric discharge machining[2001/19]
French:Procédé et dispositif d'usinage par électroérosion[2002/35]
Former [2001/19]Verfahren vor Vorrichtung zur Funkenerosionsbearbeitung
Former [2001/19]Procede et dispositif d'usinage par electroerosion
Examination procedure06.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
10.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
06.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2002Fee for grant paid
14.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.12.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.12.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS63260721  ;
 [A]JPH03294116  ;
 [DA]US4447696  (NIWA YOSHIEI [JP]) [DA] 1-20 * column 1, line 56 - line 64 * * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 24 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 2 * * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0545156  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-20* abstract *;
 [DA]US5698115  (GOTO AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-20 * column 13, line 58 - column 14, line 35 * * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890208), vol. 013, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 795), & JP63260721 A 19881027 (INOUE JAPAX RES INC) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920403), vol. 016, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 1229), & JP03294116 A 19911225 (MAKINO MILLING MACH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.