Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1104860

EP1104860 - Switchable pivoting valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/39]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Former [2001/23]For all designated states
Leica Camera GmbH
Oskar-Barnack-Strasse 11
D-35606 Solms / DE
For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kölsch, Lothar
Bürgerstrasse 22
57234 Wilnsdorf 3 / DE
02 / Kranz, Gerhard, Dr.
Österreicher Strasse 21
35576 Wetzlar / DE
03 / Kogler, Hans-Gerhard
Helgebachstrasse 55
35578 Wetzlar / DE
04 / Metz, Christoph
Morgenweide 34
35578 Wetzlar / DE
05 / Schröter, Frank
Statzenbachstrasse 28a
85368 Moosburg / DE
06 / Faulstroh, Hans-Joachim
Eglinger Strasse 6
86511 Schmiechen / DE
 [2001/23]
Representative(s)Stamer, Harald
Postfach 26 04
35536 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/23]Stamer, Harald, Dipl, -Phys.
Postfach 26 04
35536 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date00122963.223.10.2000
[2001/23]
Priority number, dateDE199915857204.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19958572
[2001/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1104860
Date:06.06.2001
Language:DE
[2001/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1104860
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1104860
Date:24.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16K1/20, F16K15/03
[2001/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2003/33]
Former [2001/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltbare Ventilklappe[2001/23]
English:Switchable pivoting valve[2001/23]
French:Soupape pivotante débrayable[2001/23]
Examination procedure11.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
14.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2003Fee for grant paid
24.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US3474809  (GORDON WILLIAM) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 67; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5437473  (HENSELER WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 18, line 3 - line 13; figure 10 *;
 [A]GB2319830  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 40; figure - *
by applicantGB2328649
 US5589494
 EP0917994
 EP0536677
 EP0800967
 GB2306409
 DE2324571