Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096226

EP1096226 - Angular velocity and acceleration sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Konaka, Yoshihiro, A170 Intellectual Property Dept
Murata Manufacturing Co.,Ltd., 2-26-10, Tenjin
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123136.425.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999030217725.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30217799
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096226
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096226
Date:12.11.2003
[2003/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096226
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01C19/56, G01P15/125, G01P15/14, G01P9/04
[2003/46]
Former International [2001/18]G01C19/56, G01P9/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/32]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehgeschwingkeits- und Beschleunigungssensor[2001/18]
English:Angular velocity and acceleration sensor[2001/18]
French:Capteur de vitesse angulaire et d'accélération[2001/18]
Examination procedure25.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/18]
19.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2006Fee for grant paid
20.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
05.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.12.2006
IT06.12.2006
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]IT06.12.2006
FR27.07.2007
Former [2007/35]IT06.12.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US4930351  (MACY DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 13 - line 66 * * column 3, line 1 - line 19 * * column 5, line 58 - line 65 * * column 6, line 61 - line 68 * * column 17, line 51 - line 68 * * column 18, line 1 - line 17 * * column 20, line 9 - line 29 * * column 20, line 44 - line 63 * * column 21, line 28 - line 68 * * figures 1,3,5,7,8,10-12,16 *;
 [X]US5691471  (OKAZAKI MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 53 - line 67 * * column 3, line 37 - line 43 * * column 11, line 6 - line 30 * * column 15, line 34 - line 43 * * figures 1,12,21 *;
 [A]DE4436396  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 30 - line 64 * * column 5, line 3 - line 54 * * figures 1,2 *