EP1096034 - Sink roll for galvanizing bath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPHATECH, INC. 526 Riverview Trail Cadiz, Kentucky 42211 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Alphatech, Inc. 526 Riverview Trail Cadiz, Kentucky 42211 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morando, Jorge A. 526 Riverview Trail Cadiz, Kentucky 42211 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123236.2 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | US19990427446 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: US 427446 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096034 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096034 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
C23C2/00 (EP,US);
Y10S118/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/27] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Führungsrolle für Feuergalvanisierungsbad | [2001/18] | English: | Sink roll for galvanizing bath | [2001/18] | French: | Rouleau immergé pour bain de galvanisation | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04258521 ; | [AP]JP2000064008 ; | [A]GB820882 (FISHER & LUDLOW LTD) [A] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 2, line 31 - line 92; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US3610387 (STEIN HANS VOM) [Y] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 1 - line 25 * * column 5, line 23 - line 35; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3713521 (MORITAKE K) [A] 1,2,5 * figures 3,6 *; | [A]EP0059270 (GARNETT DAVID MORRIS) [A] 1 * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 5; figure 6 *; | [A]GB2095193 (HANDLING DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION) [A] 1,7,8 * page 1, line 83 - line 94; figures 1,3,4 * * page 2, line 20 - line 65 *; | [A]FR2562045 (MATREX [FR]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 16 - line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0177002 (SIAT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 5; figures 1-3; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US5421442 (AGNOFF CHARLES [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 63; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE19511943 (DUMA MASCH ANLAGENBAU [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,7-14 * figure 1 *; | [YA]WO9700334 (CLECIM SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * figures 1-5; claims 1-18 * [A] 11-14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 038, Database accession no. (M - 1358), & JP04258521 A 19920914 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1,2,5,11-14 * abstract * | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000064008 A 20000229 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;NITTETSU HARD KK) [AP] 1-8,11-14 * abstract * |