Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096365

EP1096365 - Output device, method of controlling it, and medium storing a program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, SE
published on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukano, Kazuko
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
02 / Miyasaka, Masayo
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2015/15]
Former [2001/18]01 / Fukano, Kazuko
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
02 / Miyasaka, Masayo
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/15]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/10]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/18]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date00123239.626.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateJP1999030995429.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30995499
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096365
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096365
Date:14.08.2002
[2002/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096365
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/18]
TitleGerman:Ausgabegerät, Verfahren um dieses zu steuern sowie Medium um ein Programm zu speichern[2001/18]
English:Output device, method of controlling it, and medium storing a program[2001/18]
French:Dispositif de sortie, méthode pour le commande et médium de stockage d'un programme[2001/18]
Examination procedure02.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
19.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2015Fee for grant paid
19.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10185044.4  / EP2299353
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2008
Opposition(s)11.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
05.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
08.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
06.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
CY08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
SE08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2016/45]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
IE26.10.2015
LU26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/37]AT08.04.2015
BE08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU26.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
Former [2016/28]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
MC08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU26.10.2015
Former [2016/26]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
LU26.10.2015
Former [2016/07]AT08.04.2015
DK08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT08.04.2015
ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/49]ES08.04.2015
FI08.04.2015
NL08.04.2015
GR09.07.2015
PT10.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL08.04.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US4710886  (HEATH ALLEN W [US]) [X] 1,2,11,12,21,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0685819  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2,11,12,21,22 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5495559