EP1096494 - Tape cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaneda, Hiroshi TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shima, Motohiko TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Okamura, Masatoshi TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sato, Shinichi TDK Corporation, 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123242.0 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990305312 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30531299 | JP19990305336 | 27.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30533699 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096494 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1096494 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G11B23/08735 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bandkassette | [2001/18] | English: | Tape cassette | [2001/18] | French: | Cassette à bande | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11162138 ; | [XA]JPH10308086 ; | [A]JPH10144044 ; | [A]JPH1011940 ; | [PA]JPH11339430 ; | [PA]JP2000163926 ; | [A]US4646191 (GOTO SHINICHI [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 44; figures 5-7 *; | [DA]JPH04349283 (SONY CORP); | [A]US5299755 (FUJII HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column A; figure - * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11162138 A 19990618 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-9 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10308086 A 19981117 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10144044 A 19980529 (TDK CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10011940 A 19980116 (TDK CORP) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11339430 A 19991210 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [PA] 1,5 * abstract * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000163926 A 20000616 (TDK CORP) [PA] 1,5 * abstract * |