Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096358

EP1096358 - System for authenticating online content referenced in hardcopy documents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.03.2007  [2007/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[2006/13]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Greene, Daniel H.
1055 Manet Drive 6
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
02 / Dean, R. Drews
21070 White Fir Court
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
03 / Berson, Thomas A.
764 Forest Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123263.626.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999042953928.10.1999         Original published format: US 429539
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1096358
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1096358
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2001/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Beglaubigung des Online-Inhalts der in einem bedrukten Dokument referenziert ist[2001/18]
English:System for authenticating online content referenced in hardcopy documents[2001/18]
French:Système d'authentification d'un contenu en ligne référencé dans un document imprimé[2001/18]
Examination procedure22.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
07.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2006Fee for grant paid
27.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9701137  (SOLAR COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 1,4-6,9 * page 3, line 20 - line 29 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 8 * * page 15, line 10 - line 32 * * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 1 * * figures 1,4-7 * [A] 10;
 [YA]US4802217  (MICHENER JOHN R [US]) [Y] 1,4-6,9 * column 1, line 16 - line 22 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 23 * * column 5, line 19 - line 41 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 31 * * figure 1 * [A] 10;
 [A]US4926481  (COLLINS JR EARL R [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - line 63 *;
 [A]WO9851036  (NEOMEDIA TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - line 32 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 24 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 11 *