Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098548

EP1098548 - Acoustic system comprised of components connected by wireless [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2007/22]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakatsugawa, Yoshinori
c/o Yazaki Corporation, 1500, Mishuku
Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken 410-1194 / JP
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00123311.326.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateJP1999030961129.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30961199
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1098548
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1098548
Date:04.04.2007
[2007/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04R3/00, H04B7/00
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Akustisches system bestehend aus drahtlos verbundenen Bauelementen[2001/19]
English:Acoustic system comprised of components connected by wireless[2001/19]
French:Système acoustique comportant des compososants connectés sans fils[2001/19]
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/19]
26.06.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5832024  (SCHOTZ LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 17 - column 5, line 38 * * column 6, line 5 - column 11, line 24 * * column 16, line 24 - column 19, line 2 * [Y] 6-8;
 [DX]JPH07288512  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DX] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5406634  (ANDERSON CHARLES W [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 64 * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 65 *