Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098485

EP1098485 - Information providing method and information distribution apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.03.2016  [2016/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2015/15]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Toshimitsu
Fujitsu Limited
4-1-1, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Saito, Kazumi
Fujitsu Limited
4-1-1, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Yashiro, Sadao
Fujitsu Limited
4-1-1, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Muramoto, Takahide
Fujitsu Limited
4-1-1, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
05 / Goto, Masatomo
Fujitsu Limited
4-1-1, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2015/15]
Former [2001/19]01 / Suzuki, Toshimitsu
Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Saito, Kazumi
Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Yashiro, Sadao
Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Muramoto, Takahide
Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
05 / Goto, Masatomo
Fujitsu Limited, 4-1-1, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Representative(s)Fenlon, Christine Lesley , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[2015/15]
Former [2001/19]Sunderland, James Harry , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00123335.227.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateJP1999030798329.10.1999         Original published format: JP 30798399
[2001/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1098485
Date:09.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1098485
Date:02.11.2005
[2005/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098485
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F17/30, H04L29/06
[2014/47]
Former International [2001/19]H04L29/06, G06F17/30, G06F3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/27]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Nachrichten und Vorrichtung zur Verteilung von Nachrichten[2001/19]
English:Information providing method and information distribution apparatus[2001/19]
French:Méthode pour fournir des informations et dispositif de distribution d'informations[2001/19]
Examination procedure22.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/16]
22.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2015Fee for grant paid
07.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2006
Opposition(s)11.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
01.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
01.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
04.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0872990  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,14,20,32,37 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 54 * * claim 1 * [Y] 2-13,15-19,21-31,33-36,38-42;
 [XY]WO9847270  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,14,20,32,37 * abstract * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 25 * [Y] 2-13,15-19,21-31,33-36,38-42;
 [XY]EP0719016  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,14,20,32,37 * abstract * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 21 * [Y] 2-13,15-19,21-31,33-36,38-42;
 [XY]WO9815091  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,14,20,32,37 * abstract * [Y] 2-13,15-19,21-31,33-36,38-42